This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 10:10:48 (UTC).

Oportun Inc VS Portillo Bonilla

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Portillo Bonilla. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KARIN S SCHWARTZ and PELAYO A. LLAMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7855

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

PELAYO A. LLAMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

OPORTUN INC

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

PORTILLO BONILLA, FREDY JOSE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/3/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

6/3/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Judgment Entered

6/3/2020: Judgment Entered

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/13/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

12/13/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/12/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/27/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Pelayo A. Llamas; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 06/03/2020 time: 09:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less