This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/15/2020 at 02:00:54 (UTC).

Oportun Inc VS Mejia

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mejia. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PHILLIP CAMPBELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7860

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PHILLIP CAMPBELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC

Defendant

MEJIA, ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/16/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/16/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

12/16/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/12/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/27/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Phillip Campbell; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less