This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:21:27 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. VS Funes

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Funes. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELAYO A. LLAMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3273

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PELAYO A. LLAMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

FUNES, MARIA CONCEPCION

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

8/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

8/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

9/15/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

6/19/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

6/19/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/27/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/27/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/28/2020: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/31/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Pelayo A. Llamas; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 10/14/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 06/19/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less