This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/25/2020 at 02:17:54 (UTC).

Oportun Inc VS Fajardo Cabezas

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fajardo Cabezas. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BENTRISH A SATARZADEH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0519

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

OPORTUN INC

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

FAJARDO CABEZAS, ROSALIA

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/26/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/26/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

12/26/2019: Judgment Entered

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/19/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

10/11/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish A Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less