This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/15/2020 at 17:37:59 (UTC).

Ohlsson VS JP Morgan Bank,

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Ohlsson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JP Morgan Bank. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0242

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OHLSSON, DIANE

Defendants

JP MORGAN BANK,

MTC FINANCIAL INC.

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARA, TONY

MALCOM, WILLIAM G.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint Filed for Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

6/23/2020: Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint Filed for Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

Demurrer Sustained in Part W/O Leave to Amend

6/11/2020: Demurrer Sustained in Part W/O Leave to Amend

Opposition Filed

4/30/2020: Opposition Filed

Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

2/24/2020: Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/23/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

1/23/2020: Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

Opposition Filed

1/3/2020: Opposition Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to JP Morgan Bank, Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to JP Morgan Bank, Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to MTC Financial Inc. Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to MTC Financial Inc. Filed

Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

12/10/2019: Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Bayview Loan Servicing LLC

Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed

12/12/2019: Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed

Civil Ex-Parte 11/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 24

11/12/2019: Civil Ex-Parte 11/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 24

Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

11/13/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

11/15/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

First Amended Complaint Filed

11/5/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/23/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 03/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

10/24/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPretrial Conference 02/26/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/15/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 03/08/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketOther Ex Parte Reservation Set for dept: 511 date: 10/25/2019 time: 09:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of (Ex Parte) For TRO Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order Filed for Diane Ohlsson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Diane Ohlsson

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMORGAN BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TONY CARA