This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2021 at 05:50:05 (UTC).

Ogletree VS The Basketry, Inc. a Louisiana corporation

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Ogletree filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Basketry, Inc a Louisiana corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2771

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OGLETREE, ANITA

Defendant

THE BASKETRY, INC. A LOUISIANA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FERRELL, SCOTT J.

STIMPERT ESQ, MARC R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conf Continuance 03/07/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

9/7/2021: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/07/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/25/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

5/19/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

5/7/2021: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

3/30/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Set Aside Filed

1/7/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Set Aside Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

1/21/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Case Management Statement of Anita Ogletree Filed

1/26/2021: Case Management Statement of Anita Ogletree Filed

Motion Set Aside Entry of Default & Quash Service of Process - Motion Rescheduled

11/19/2020: Motion Set Aside Entry of Default & Quash Service of Process - Motion Rescheduled

Case Management Statement of Anita Ogletree Filed

8/5/2020: Case Management Statement of Anita Ogletree Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/12/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/07/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Anita Ogletree Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder from DCA Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 09/16/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party The Basketry, Inc. a Louisiana corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of CMC and Order (Amended) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to The Basketry, Inc. a Louisiana corporation Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/10/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Basketry, Inc. a Louisiana corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anita Ogletree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIMPERT ESQ, MARC R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL SCOTT J