This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 04:47:50 (UTC).

O'Farrell VS ABB, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 O'Farrell filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, THOMAS RASCH and BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3962

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

THOMAS RASCH

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'FARRELL, DONNA

O'FARRELL, RICHARD

Defendants

ABB, INC.

SB DECKING, INC.

CRANE CO.

GRAYBEAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

GREENE TWEED & CO. INC.

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

SIEMENS INDSTRY, INC.

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC (USA), INC.

WARREN PUMPS, LLC

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION F/K/A THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY

JOHN CRANE INC.

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FOLEY, CRYSTAL G.

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

ZAPALA, ALAN J

PRZETAK, LAURA

MCCORMICK, JENNIFER M.

WANG, GALEN B

OBERG, LISA L.

RASMUSSEN, JENNIFER C.

DUFFY, JOSEPH

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J

SHAFFER, D. SCOTT

CAMPAGNE, INGRID T.

BERGSTROM, EMILY D.

LIN, CARRIE S

GAGE, NICOLE E.

MARTIN, NICOLAS P

JACKSON, D. MARK

POND, FRANK D.

FOUNTAIN, BILL D.

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

5/18/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

5/17/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 02/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

1/6/2021: Case Management Conference 02/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Plaintiffs' page and line Designation of robert Cutis 7/14/2016 Filed

7/12/2021: Plaintiffs' page and line Designation of robert Cutis 7/14/2016 Filed

Objections of Gould Electronics INC. Filed

7/20/2021: Objections of Gould Electronics INC. Filed

Response To Separate Statement In Support Of Motion Filed

7/2/2021: Response To Separate Statement In Support Of Motion Filed

Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

7/2/2021: Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted

Reply Brief in Support of Motion Pltff's Motion for Preference in Trial Setting Filed

4/1/2021: Reply Brief in Support of Motion Pltff's Motion for Preference in Trial Setting Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition MOTO Filed

3/26/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition MOTO Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Greene Tweed & Co. INC.

3/3/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Greene Tweed & Co. INC.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Filed

1/29/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/20/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

271 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Richard O'Farrell, Donna O'Farrell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/04/2022 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2021 10:30 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Pretrial Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Law and Motion 08/13/2021 09:30 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2021 10:30 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
339 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Velan Valve Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Richard O'Farrell, Donna O'Farrell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC (USA), INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant