This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 21:58:05 (UTC).

Odem-Childers VS Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Odem-Childers filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9322

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

METCLAID INSULATION LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

CHEVRON U.S.A, INC.

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

WARREN PUMPS LLC

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

LANDSEA HOLDING COMPANY

SOCO-WEST, INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

TOSCO CORPORATION

NIBCO INC.

TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC.

KEENAN PROPERTIES, INC.

GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY

WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC.

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

42 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/21/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

7/18/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Request for Dismissal

05/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

05/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

05/20/2022: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

Answer

05/19/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

05/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

05/12/2022: Answer

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Plaintiffs' Compliance Hearing Statement and Request for Case Management Conference

05/12/2022: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) Plaintiffs' Compliance Hearing Statement and Request for Case Management Conference

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

05/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer

05/06/2022: Answer

591 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Charles Odem-Childers (Plaintiff); Cynthia Odem (Plaintiff) As to: Warren Pumps LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Odem-childers on 05/14/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Charles Odem-Childers and Cynthia Odem as to Bigge Crane and Rigging Co.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 05/20/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Charles Odem-Childers (Plaintiff); Cynthia Odem (Plaintiff) As to: Bigge Crane and Rigging Co. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by Odem-childers on 05/14/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Charles Odem-Childers and Cynthia Odem as to Slakey Brothers, Inc.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Transdigm, Inc., individually and as parent or alter ego and successor-in-interest to Kirkhill Rubber Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Charles Odem-Childers (Plaintiff); Cynthia Odem (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Petro-Chem Insulation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
592 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 07/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charles Odem-Childers; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less