This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 18:08:47 (UTC).

Oceguera VS Jaber

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Oceguera filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jaber. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5768

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Christofer R. Chapman

Gina Dashman Boer

Gregory R DeLaPena

Kevin N. LaBarbera

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Personal Service

05/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons on Complaint

05/05/2022: Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint

05/05/2022: Cross-Complaint

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

04/26/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)

04/26/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)

Order re: Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate and Continue Trial Date

04/26/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate and Continue Trial Date

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate and Co...)

04/26/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate and Co...)

Declaration REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

04/18/2022: Declaration REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

Reply REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

04/18/2022: Reply REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

Supplemental Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KARATOV IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

04/11/2022: Supplemental Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. KARATOV IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COMPLETE CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. RG19005768 WITH CASE NO. RG21094102 AND TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE IN CASE NO. RG19005768

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

04/07/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

04/07/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

04/07/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application For an Order Shortening Time Re Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

04/07/2022: Ex Parte Application For an Order Shortening Time Re Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave

04/04/2022: Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

04/04/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Jad Jaber (Defendant); Suad Jaber (Defendant); Najeeb Shihadeh (Defendant); Mary C Shihadeh (Defendant); Daoud Salfiti (Defendant); Hala Salfiti (Defendant); Fahed Mina Salfiti (Defendant); Haifa Fahed Salfiti (Defendant) As to: Spanish Speaking Unity Council of Alameda, Inc. (Cross-Defendant) Service Date: 05/11/2022 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Gregory R DeLaPena (Attorney); Jad Jaber (Defendant); Suad Jaber (Defendant); Najeeb Shihadeh (Defendant); Mary C Shihadeh (Defendant); Daoud Salfiti (Defendant); Hala Salfiti (Defendant); Fahed Mina Salfiti (Defendant); Haifa Fahed Salfiti (Defendant) As to: Spanish Speaking Unity Council of Alameda, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Cross-Complaint Filed by: Jad Jaber (Defendant); Suad Jaber (Defendant); Najeeb Shihadeh (Defendant); Mary C Shihadeh (Defendant); Daoud Salfiti (Defendant); Hala Salfiti (Defendant); Fahed Mina Salfiti (Defendant); Haifa Fahed Salfiti (Defendant) As to: Spanish Speaking Unity Council of Alameda, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/05/2022 01:30 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 01:30 PM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/26/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/26/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Motion to Consolidate and Continue Trial Date scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Adrian Rodriguez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Edgar Rodriguez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Carlos Enrique Esquivel; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Julio Cesar Miranda Aldana; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Josue Isaac Estrada Aldana; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Mateo Oceguera; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Kevin Oceguera; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Jose Antonio Oceguera; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jose Oceguera; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOER, GINA DASHMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELAPENA, GREGORY R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAPMAN CHRISTOFER