Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 15:31:51 (UTC).

Ocampo VS AAMCO Transmissions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 Ocampo filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AAMCO Transmissions, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, FRANK ROESCH and ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1182

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

FRANK ROESCH

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

OCAMPO, ELVIA

OCAMPO, RICARDO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SOCO-WEST, INC.

MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA

COURTESY CHEVROLET CENTER

CANEPA GROUP, INC.

AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC.

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC

MMIP DEALER CORP I

SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY (US) HOLDINGS, INC.

PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS, INC.

NORTH AMERICAN SUBARU, INC.

GEO H. WILSON, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD

CALAVERAS NATURAL RESOURCES

SEMITECH CORPORATION

SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.

SEMTECH CORPORATION

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

COUNSEL, DESIGNATED DEFENSE

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PAUL, JOSHUA

WILLIAMSON, IAN G

SHARP, GARY D.

ROTH, DAVID V.

DILLON, IAN P.

ONGARO, DAVID R

BROWN JR., EUGENE

THOMPSON, ROBERT W.

GRUEN, LISA P.

GRIFFIN, THOMAS N

HOOD, JEFF S.

POND, FRANK D.

ORTIZ, ANTHONY S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Case Management Order and Case Management Conference Filed

9/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Order and Case Management Conference Filed

Proof of Service RE: Notice of Case Management Order Filed

9/22/2020: Proof of Service RE: Notice of Case Management Order Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

9/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Granted

5/29/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Granted

Page And Line Designation for the Deposition of Third Party Witness John Evers Filed

8/14/2020: Page And Line Designation for the Deposition of Third Party Witness John Evers Filed

Jury Question Filed

8/3/2020: Jury Question Filed

Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued

7/2/2020: Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued

Trial Brief Re: Inadmissibility of Former Testimony Filed

6/12/2020: Trial Brief Re: Inadmissibility of Former Testimony Filed

Pltfs' Reply te Honeywell's amndd objs. and counter to page line of E. Rogers dtd 1/5/84 Filed

6/18/2020: Pltfs' Reply te Honeywell's amndd objs. and counter to page line of E. Rogers dtd 1/5/84 Filed

pltfs' reply re Honeywell's objs. and counters to page line of J. B. Charm dtd 11/9/05 Filed

6/18/2020: pltfs' reply re Honeywell's objs. and counters to page line of J. B. Charm dtd 11/9/05 Filed

Pltfs' reply re Honeywell's Amndd objs and counters to page line of E. Rogers dtd 9/27/91 Filed

6/19/2020: Pltfs' reply re Honeywell's Amndd objs and counters to page line of E. Rogers dtd 9/27/91 Filed

Declaration of Robert C. Rodriguez ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Reply Filed

4/16/2020: Declaration of Robert C. Rodriguez ISO Motion for Summary Judgment Reply Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion Rescheduled

4/9/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion Rescheduled

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

12/16/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

11/25/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

588 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmail dropping reservation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 11/20/2020 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 10/23/2020 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion for CCP 128.7 Sanctions Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 10/16/2020 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion for CCP 128.7 Sanctions Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 10/16/2020 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion for New Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 11/17/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ricardo Ocampo, Elvia Ocampo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ricardo Ocampo, Elvia Ocampo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
815 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re Case Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 12/20/2019 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ricardo Ocampo, Elvia Ocampo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEO H. WILSON, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY (US) HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MMIP DEALER CORP I is a litigant

Latest cases where CANEPA GROUP, INC. is a litigant