This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 15:33:08 (UTC).

Oakland Athletics Baseball Co VS AIG Specialty Insurance Com

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Oakland Athletics Baseball Co filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against AIG Specialty Insurance Com. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Brad Seligman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9003

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Brad Seligman

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

NEW YORK YANKEES PAR

LOS ANGELES DODGERS LLC

TEXAS RANGERS

HOUSTON ASTROS, LLC

LOS ANGELES ANGELS

MIAMI MARLINS

BOSTON RED SOX BASEBALL CLUB LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

WASHINGTON NATIONALS BASEBALL CLUB

PHILADELPHIA PHILLIES

DETROIT TIGERS INC

SEATTLE MARINERS

CLEVELAND INDIANS BASEBALL COMPANY LLC

TICKETS.COM

NEW YORK METS

ARIZONA DIAMONDBACKS

SAN DIEGO PADRES

BALTIMORE ORIOLES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

OAKLAND ATHLETICS BASEBALL COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY CPMPANY

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Bryce L. Friedman

Chet A. Kroneberg

David Simonton

Isaac Rethy

Jodi K. Swick

Rani Gupta

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/29/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Proof of Service Joint Submission Of Parties Proposed Case Management Orders25031550 Filed

7/29/2021: Proof of Service Joint Submission Of Parties Proposed Case Management Orders25031550 Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

05/24/2022: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

Objection objections

05/18/2022: Objection objections

Request for Judicial Notice

05/18/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition opposition

05/18/2022: Opposition opposition

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

05/17/2022: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

05/17/2022: Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

484 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/23/2023 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Objection objections Filed by: Oakland Athletics Baseball Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Oakland Athletics Baseball Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Oakland Athletics Baseball Company (Plaintiff) As to: AIG Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Opposition opposition Filed by: Oakland Athletics Baseball Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Oakland Athletics Baseball Company (Plaintiff) As to: Factory Mutual Insurance Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
407 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Insurance Coverage Claims (from Complex Case) As to Interst; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Factory Mutual Insurance Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Interstate Fire & Casualty Cpmpany Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to AIG Specialty Insurance Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 01/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 12/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Oakland Athletics Baseball Company; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Insurance Coverage Claims (from Complex Case) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less