Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 01/24/2021 at 00:11:29 (UTC).

Nystrom VS ABB, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Nystrom filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN and JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3252

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NYSTROM, BARBARA ANN

NYSTROM, DARRELL

Defendants

ABB, INC.

AIW-2000 WIND DOWN CORP.

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

BW/IP, INC.

OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION

THE OKONITE COMPANY

CRANE CO.

ERICSSON, INC.

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

ELLIOTT COMPANY

SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ASHRAFI ESQ, BENNO

CATALDO, LORI L.

MILBRODT, JEREMY D.

LISTER, JOHN R.

LEWIS, STEPHEN C.

STEELE, D. DAVID

RIDLEY, SHAWN M.

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES P.

FOUNTAIN, BILL D.

MCELHENNEY, MARCUS N.

BLAIR, LYNNE P.

DAVIS, GEOFFREY

DUFFY, JOSEPH

HUGO, EDWARD R.

BAILEY, BOB R.

GAGE, NICOLE E.

RAJAZI, LEILA RENEE

KELLY, DANIEL J.

PIEPER, TIMOTHY C.

PORTILLO, ANA T.

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

1/15/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 11/06/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

7/20/2018: Case Management Conference 11/06/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

5/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ABB, Inc. Filed

1/30/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ABB, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

3/29/2019: Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

Objections of Aurora Pump Company Filed

2/22/2019: Objections of Aurora Pump Company Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Filed

2/8/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Schneider Electric USA, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. Filed

1/30/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. Filed

Notice of That Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. Motion for SUmmary Judgment is OFF C

1/14/2019: Notice of That Defendant Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc. Motion for SUmmary Judgment is OFF C

Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

12/21/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Siemens Industry, Inc.

12/13/2018: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Siemens Industry, Inc.

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/14/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC

12/7/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC

Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

12/7/2018: Case Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed

11/2/2018: Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Occidental Chemical Corporation

8/16/2018: Answer to Complaint Filed for Occidental Chemical Corporation

Answer to Complaint Filed for Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.

8/20/2018: Answer to Complaint Filed for Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to General Cable Technologies Corp. Filed

8/15/2018: Proof of Service on Complaint As to General Cable Technologies Corp. Filed

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2021 10:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Darrell Nystrom, Barbara Ann Nystrom Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
458 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Eton Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Cytec Industries, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Crane Co. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/06/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 09/04/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Depositing Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Darrell Nystrom

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE OKONITE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where OEWEN-ILLINOIS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABB INC. is a litigant