This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 01:26:44 (UTC).

Northern California Collections Services, Inc. VS Misaghi

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Northern California Collections Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Misaghi. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7915

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONS SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

MISAGHI, KAMRAN

MISAGHI , ANOSHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CRIBB, STEVEN D.

ZEME, SUSAN WINER

GINSBURG, DAVID R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

10/2/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/28/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

9/23/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion for Summary Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled

9/23/2021: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

5/26/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

1/14/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Collections As to Kamran Misaghi, Anosha Misaghi Filed

9/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Collections As to Kamran Misaghi, Anosha Misaghi Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Kamran Misaghi, Anosha Misaghi Filed

2/3/2020: Case Management Statement of Kamran Misaghi, Anosha Misaghi Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collections Services, Inc.

9/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collections Services, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/24/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Order Continuing Case Management Conference Filed

9/24/2019: Order Continuing Case Management Conference Filed

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Collections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 521 date: 12/02/2021 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMini Minutes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of to Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry of Default Reject Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Change of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion for Change of Venue and Request for Sanctions Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collections Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Ryan Ginsburg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEME, SUSAN WINER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRIBB STEVEN