Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/06/2021 at 01:54:13 (UTC).

Northern California Collection Ser VS Artcad Builders, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Northern California Collection Ser filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Artcad Builders, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0075

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE, INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

ARTCAD BUILDERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CRIBB, STEVEN D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Filed

9/30/2020: Notice of Hearing Filed

Judgment Entered

12/8/2020: Judgment Entered

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/23/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/23/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

5/27/2020: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

Case Management Statement of Northern California Collection Service, Inc. Filed

5/6/2020: Case Management Statement of Northern California Collection Service, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

5/6/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed - One th

5/11/2020: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed - One th

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/26/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed

3/2/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed

Complaint - Collections Filed

1/10/2020: Complaint - Collections Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collection Service, Inc.

1/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collection Service, Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/10/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

1/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDefault Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 02/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered as to Artcad Builders, Inc. . Judgment Routed to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed - One th

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Northern California Collection Service, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Artcad Builders, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Northern California Collection Service, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTION SERVICE INC. is a litigant