This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/12/2020 at 08:42:26 (UTC).

Norovzian VS Westrn Dental

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Norovzian filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Westrn Dental. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENTRISH A SATARZADEH and CANDACE GOLDMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0308

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

CANDACE GOLDMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOROVZIAN, PARVIN

Defendant

WESTRN DENTAL

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

1/10/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

1/9/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/27/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

12/27/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/27/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

11/7/2019: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

10/17/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/16/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

8/23/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

8/27/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Westrn Dental Filed

8/19/2019: Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Westrn Dental Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/7/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Candace Goldman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/27/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish A Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 511 date: 12/27/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Westrn Dental Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Parvin Norovzian Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Parvin Norovzian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less