This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 09:17:35 (UTC).

Noriega VS Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Noriega filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9613

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORIEGA, YVONEE RENWW

Defendant

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WESTRICK, SHAWN C

GELLER, JASON A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

5/20/2021: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yvonee Renww Noriega

5/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yvonee Renww Noriega

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/20/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/24/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

5/24/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

Answer to Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

6/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Filed

5/27/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Filed

Notice of of Filing Notice of Removal Filed

6/30/2021: Notice of of Filing Notice of Removal Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 17; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/25/2022 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Filing Notice of Removal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/03/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yvonee Renww Noriega

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER, JASON A