This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 02:36:55 (UTC).

Ninio VS Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Ninio filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1732

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NINIO, NISSIM

Defendants

OFF THE HOOK YACHT SALES, LLC

CD BRIGHAM MARINE SURVEYING AND CONSULTING, LLC

THOMPSON, GEORGE

MARINE MAX EAST INC

BRIGHAM, CRAIG D

THOMPSON TRUCKING COMPANY INC

STANCILL, BRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTON, MARK

ROSE, BRADLEY M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/26/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

5/10/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

6/29/2021: Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

Complaint Fraud Filed

3/11/2021: Complaint Fraud Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nissim Ninio

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nissim Ninio

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/11/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

3/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/21/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Off The Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, Brett Stancill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nissim Ninio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMPSON TRUCKING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTON, MARK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSE BRADLEY MICHAEL