This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 06:43:26 (UTC).

Nguyen VS Nguyen

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Nguyen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nguyen. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7864

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ, LOGAN

NGUYEN, KATHY TRANG QUYEN

GONZALEZ, GIULIANO

GONZALEZ, TONY JR.

GONZALEZ, GIANNI

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FRANKLIN, GARY DARNELL JR.

NGUYEN, VYEN-KHANH DOWAKING

NGUYEN, CHUONG KITAC

25, ROES 1

NGUYEN, UYEN-KHANH DONNA KING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DAO, LOAN

LOH, ALICE

KIM ESQ, CHRISTINA E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

10/29/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

9/8/2021: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

Order to Consolidate Cases Filed

8/24/2021: Order to Consolidate Cases Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - To Vacate Trial Date

9/2/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - To Vacate Trial Date

Case Management Statement of Gary Darnell Franklin Jr. Filed

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Gary Darnell Franklin Jr. Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

3/2/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Kathy Trang Quyen Nguyen Filed

2/26/2021: Case Management Statement of Kathy Trang Quyen Nguyen Filed

Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Vyen-Khanh Dowaking Nguyen, Chuong Kitac Nguyen

1/12/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Vyen-Khanh Dowaking Nguyen, Chuong Kitac Nguyen

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

1/12/2021: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Vyen-Khanh Dowaking Nguyen, Chuong Kitac Nguyen

1/12/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Vyen-Khanh Dowaking Nguyen, Chuong Kitac Nguyen

Cross-Complaint Filed for Gary Darnell Franklin Jr.

1/29/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Gary Darnell Franklin Jr.

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

1/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Notice of of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

1/29/2021: Notice of of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: ADR; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 24 date: 07/20/2022 time: 09:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Pretrial Conference 09/02/2022 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/12/2022 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Giuliano Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Tony Gonzalez Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Gianni Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Logan Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kathy Trang Quyen Nguyen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAO, LOAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, CHRISTINA E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOH, ALICE K.