This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 05:54:24 (UTC).

New England Lead Burning Comp VS Washington Hospital Healthc

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 New England Lead Burning Comp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Washington Hospital Healthc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8898

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW ENGLAND LEAD BURNING COMPANY, A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

Defendants

WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, A CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ASHLEY, EUGENE

FIRSTMAN, ERIC J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

6/7/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Case Management Statement of New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation Filed

4/21/2021: Case Management Statement of New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation Filed

Notice of Of Bond Filed

2/19/2021: Notice of Of Bond Filed

Bond Filed for Plaintiff

2/19/2021: Bond Filed for Plaintiff

Notice of Bond Filed

2/22/2021: Notice of Bond Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

1/5/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed

1/11/2021: Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for a Security Undertaking Granted in Part

1/19/2021: Motion for a Security Undertaking Granted in Part

Motion for a Security Undertaking Filed by Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healt

12/11/2020: Motion for a Security Undertaking Filed by Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healt

Case Management Statement of New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation Filed

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement of New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation Filed

Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healthcare district

12/1/2020: Case Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healthcare district

Proof of Service Filed

8/21/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/29/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 04/18/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 04/08/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/10/2022 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/07/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healthcare district

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Washington Hospital Healthcare System, a California healthcare distric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for New England Lead Burning Company, a Massachusetts corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW ENGLAND LEAD BURNING COMPANY, A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WASHINGTON HOSPITAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, A CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIRSTMAN, ERIC J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHLEY, EUGENE