This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 10:02:52 (UTC).

Neptune Water Solutions Inc. VS Bridgestone Retail Operation

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Neptune Water Solutions Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Bridgestone Retail Operation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4521

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEPTUNE WATER SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendant

BRIDGESTONE RETAIL OPERATIONS

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/22/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 105; Action: Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 11/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less