This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/09/2020 at 00:19:01 (UTC).

Nelson VS Smith

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Nelson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4098

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NERI, MARIKO JHUVHEL

NELSON, BRUCE

NELSON, AMABELLA

Defendants

SMITH, RITA

MARIA S. CATAO AND ANA S. CATAO AS TRUSTEES OF THE CATAO FAMILY TRUST DATED MARCH 26, 1997

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOLTON, BLAKE E.

KARATOV, MICHAEL A.

HUNTER, ALAN F.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/16/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Rita Smith Filed

9/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Rita Smith Filed

Case Management Statement of Bruce Nelson, Amabella Nelson Filed

9/14/2020: Case Management Statement of Bruce Nelson, Amabella Nelson Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Maria S. Catao and Ana S. Catao as trustees of the Catao Family Trust

6/22/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Maria S. Catao and Ana S. Catao as trustees of the Catao Family Trust

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

6/22/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Rita Smith

6/25/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Rita Smith

Notice of Jury Trial Filed

6/25/2020: Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Statement of Rita Smith Filed

6/26/2020: Case Management Statement of Rita Smith Filed

Case Management Statement of Maria S. Catao and Ana S. Catao as trustees of the Catao Family Trust D

7/1/2020: Case Management Statement of Maria S. Catao and Ana S. Catao as trustees of the Catao Family Trust D

Case Management Statement of Bruce Nelson, Amabella Nelson, Mariko Jhuvhel Neri Filed

7/7/2020: Case Management Statement of Bruce Nelson, Amabella Nelson, Mariko Jhuvhel Neri Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/14/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/13/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bruce Nelson

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bruce Nelson

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

2/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 12/16/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 07/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Rita Smith Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Rita Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Maria S. Catao and Ana S. Catao as trustees of the Catao Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/14/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bruce Nelson

    Read MoreRead Less