Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/10/2020 at 03:14:03 (UTC).

Nelson VS Modlin

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Modlin. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3114

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON, CHARLEAN

Defendants

MODLIN, CAROL

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

LO, AMY W.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/4/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Charlean Nelson Filed

8/12/2020: Case Management Statement of Charlean Nelson Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/24/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Carol Modlin, California Department of General Services, California Dep

4/27/2020: Case Management Statement of Carol Modlin, California Department of General Services, California Dep

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

5/5/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

4/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Carol Modlin, California Department of General Services, C

1/31/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Carol Modlin, California Department of General Services, C

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

12/23/2019: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/12/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

12/13/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

11/14/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charlean Nelson

11/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charlean Nelson

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/14/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

11/15/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/15/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/09/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Charlean Nelson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 09/08/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Carol Modlin Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of General Services Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Charlean Nelson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT GENERAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larsen, Brian L.