Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 17:26:23 (UTC).

Negron VS Figueroa

Case Summary

On 09/14/2011 Negron filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Figueroa. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD WOOD and BURNS, WILLIAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5017

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD WOOD

BURNS, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEGRON, VIVIAN

Defendant

FIGUEROA, ANNA

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/14/2011: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial 10/12/2011 02:00 PM D- 702

9/14/2011: Small Claims Court Trial 10/12/2011 02:00 PM D- 702

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/26/2011: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

10/12/2011: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

10/12/2011: Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

10/12/2011: Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

10/26/2011: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

10/26/2011: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2011
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Burns, William Temporary Judge; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Richard Wood; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 10/26/2011 time: 02:01 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/12/2011 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less