Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 11:34:27 (UTC).

NC Marble & Granite, Inc. VS Haverland

Case Summary

On 06/13/2000 NC Marble Granite, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Haverland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTINE K. MORUZA, GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR., HARRY R. SHEPPARD, RICHARD W. KESSELL and APPEALS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3573

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CHRISTINE K. MORUZA

GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR.

HARRY R. SHEPPARD

RICHARD W. KESSELL

APPEALS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NC MARBLE & GRANITE, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HAVERLAND, JANET

HAVERLAND, STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FOX, CRAIG S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

6/13/2000: Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Steve Haverland, Janet Haverland

7/19/2000: Cross-Complaint Filed for Steve Haverland, Janet Haverland

Rejection Letter Issued on Summons with Proof of Service

7/21/2000: Rejection Letter Issued on Summons with Proof of Service

Answer To Cross-Complaint Filed for NC Marble & Granite, Inc.

8/14/2000: Answer To Cross-Complaint Filed for NC Marble & Granite, Inc.

Case Management Conference 10/26/2000 09:00 AM D- 705

9/19/2000: Case Management Conference 10/26/2000 09:00 AM D- 705

Case Management Statement Filed

10/20/2000: Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

10/24/2000: Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/26/2000: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

File Transmitted to Arbitration Dept.-Superior Court Filed

11/1/2000: File Transmitted to Arbitration Dept.-Superior Court Filed

Notice of proposed arbitrators Filed

11/7/2000: Notice of proposed arbitrators Filed

Notice of final assignment arbitrator Filed

12/4/2000: Notice of final assignment arbitrator Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

3/5/2001: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

Statement Filed

4/9/2001: Statement Filed

Statement and Status Report Re: Arbitration Filed

4/11/2001: Statement and Status Report Re: Arbitration Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/31/2001: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Miscellaneous Reference to Compliance Calendar Filed

5/31/2001: Miscellaneous Reference to Compliance Calendar Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/13/2001: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/13/2001: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Harry R. Sheppard; Department: Dept 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • DocketHearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 705 date: 09/10/2001 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Christine K. Moruza; Department: Dept 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Reference to Compliance Calendar Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 08/13/2001 03:00 PM D- 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Appeals Judge; Department: Dept 705

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/26/2000 09:00 AM D- 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to NC Marble & Granite, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Cross-Complaint Filed for NC Marble & Granite, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Summons with Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2000
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Steve Haverland, Janet Haverland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Steve Haverland, Janet Haverland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2000
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less