This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 20:07:20 (UTC).

NationsBanc Mortgage VS Rouse

Case Summary

On 04/02/1998 NationsBanc Mortgage filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rouse. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7407

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

NATIONSBANC MORTGAGE

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant

ROUSE, JOHN T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HUNTER, WENDY M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

4/2/1998: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for NationsBanc Mortgage

4/22/1998: Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for NationsBanc Mortgage

Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted

4/27/1998: Application Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted

Civil OSC - Complaints 05/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

5/14/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 05/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

5/28/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Summons with Proof of Service As to John T. Rouse Filed

6/3/1998: Summons with Proof of Service As to John T. Rouse Filed

Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered

6/3/1998: Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered

Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

7/1/1998: Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

Civil OSC - Complaints 01/19/1999 02:00 PM D- 14

11/6/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 01/19/1999 02:00 PM D- 14

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

1/19/1999: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

Partial Dismissal as to Money Damages Entered without Prejudice

1/19/1999: Partial Dismissal as to Money Damages Entered without Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Dismissal - UD Money Pending; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPartial Dismissal as to Money Damages Entered without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 01/19/1999 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Hearing Dropped from dept: 14 date: 06/29/1998 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To John T. Rouse Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • DocketDefault Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • DocketRequest for Judgment Default : Clerk CCP 1169/Money Pending Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons with Proof of Service As to John T. Rouse Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Failure to Comply with Local Rules 5.1; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 06/29/1998 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 05/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Posting Summons and Complaint Filed for NationsBanc Mortgage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less