This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 07:31:04 (UTC).

National Union fire Insurance Company VS Brott

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 National Union fire Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brott. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Nol Wise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2872

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Nol Wise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

BROTT, HALEY

Haley Brott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SUTHERLAND, JAMES B.

Chandrani Mandal

James B. Sutherland

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

9/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

09/16/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for National Union fire Insurance Company

09/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for National Union fire Insurance Company

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

09/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

09/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

09/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement

01/12/2022: Case Management Statement

General Order (Case Management Order)

01/26/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

01/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

02/22/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

02/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Haley Brott (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Haley Brott (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: National Union fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff) As to: Haley Brott (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 01/22/2022 Service Cost: 65.00 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/08/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: National Union fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 01/31/2022 09:00 AM D- 24; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for National Union fire Insurance Company; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sutherland, James B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDAL, CHANDRANI