This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 04:01:16 (UTC).

Narensky VS Hurtubise

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Narensky filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hurtubise. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3933

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVALOS, JAVIER

NARENSKY, MICHAEL

Defendants

CHONG, SUE

HURTUBISE, THOMAS

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

HURTUBISE, SEBASTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KINDLEY, GEORGE R.

HAYES, STEPHEN M.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

11/9/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

12/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for State Farm General Insurance Company

9/11/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for State Farm General Insurance Company

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

7/28/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

7/28/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

7/31/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm General Insurance Company Filed

7/16/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm General Insurance Company Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

6/8/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Narensky

6/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Narensky

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/8/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

6/11/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 11/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/11/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 01/29/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/11/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for State Farm General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm General Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Narensky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINDLEY, GEORGE R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES STEPHEN MICHAEL