This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 00:07:56 (UTC).

Naranjo VS San Jose Healthcare System, LP

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Naranjo filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against San Jose Healthcare System, LP. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3078

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NARANJO , LINDA

Defendants

JAVED , JEFFREY M.D

BOLTON , SHAMKEA R.N

REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAN JOSE

SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LP

MOHSENI , VICTORIA R.T

GONZALEZ , SHANNON S.T

HASSAN , KASHIF M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZINN, CARTER M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Linda Naranjo Filed

7/23/2021: Case Management Statement of Linda Naranjo Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

3/24/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Naranjo

3/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Naranjo

Summons Issued and Filed

3/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

4/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Linda Naranjo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linda Naranjo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Jose Healthcare System, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAM JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZINN, CARTER M.