Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 00:02:52 (UTC).

Nabulsi VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Nabulsi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5880

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NABULSI , AMRO AL

Defendants

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

CITY OF OAKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GEOULLA ESQ, DANIEL D.

ZIEGLER, DONNA R.

PARKER, BARBARA J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Amro Al Nabulsi Filed

10/1/2020: Case Management Statement of Amro Al Nabulsi Filed

Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Declaration of Vadim Sidelnikovin Filed

1/13/2020: Declaration of Vadim Sidelnikovin Filed

Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2020 02:00 PM D- 517

1/16/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 01/22/2020 02:00 PM D- 517

Declaration in Support Defts' Request for Informal Discovery Conference Filed

1/17/2020: Declaration in Support Defts' Request for Informal Discovery Conference Filed

Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

1/30/2020: Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

10/24/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

Answer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda

10/25/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed

11/4/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

9/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/19/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amro Al Nabulsi

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amro Al Nabulsi

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

9/19/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Amro Al Nabulsi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/18/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Vadim Sidelnikovin Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: County of Alameda Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for County of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for City of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amro Al Nabulsi

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIEGLER, DONNA R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER BARBARA JEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOULLA DANIEL D