Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 01:10:16 (UTC).

Morgan VS Owl Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Morgan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Owl Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7006

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORGAN-MEIKLE, CHANDRA

MORGAN, LARRY

MORGAN, WILLIAM

Defendants

MORALES, HENRY

OWL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KRANKEMANN, W. CHRISTIAN

KATZ ESQ, MARC

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/26/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Henry Morales Filed

1/25/2021: Case Management Statement of Henry Morales Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

1/25/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Owl Inc., Henry Morales Filed

11/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Owl Inc., Henry Morales Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

5/27/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Owl Inc., Henry Morales Filed

3/3/2020: Case Management Statement of Owl Inc., Henry Morales Filed

Case Management Statement of William Morgan, Chandra Morgan-Meikle, Larry Morgan Filed

3/4/2020: Case Management Statement of William Morgan, Chandra Morgan-Meikle, Larry Morgan Filed

Case Management Statement of William Morgan, Chandra Morgan-Meikle, Larry Morgan Filed

1/22/2020: Case Management Statement of William Morgan, Chandra Morgan-Meikle, Larry Morgan Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/12/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

5/1/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 09/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/1/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 04/04/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 03/18/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/18/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Owl Inc., Henry Morales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Owl Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Henry Morales Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Chandra Morgan-Meikle as Succssor in Interest Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Larry Morgan as Successor In Interest of William Morgan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Morgan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OWL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katz, Marc

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRANKEMANN, W. CHRISTIAN