Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 08:54:37 (UTC).

Moreno VS Farmers Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Moreno filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Farmers Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONNI MACLAREN, JAMES REILLY and JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0150

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONNI MACLAREN

JAMES REILLY

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

MORENO , LUIS GARCIA

Defendants and Others

FARMERS GROUP, INC.

COPART-DALLAS INC

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

WILLIAMS, JOHN

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KAPLUNOVSKY, ELIYAHU YULI

MAILE, CHRISTOPHER S.

LEE, CATHERINE M.

JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2021 01:30 PM D- 22

8/25/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/27/2021 01:30 PM D- 22

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/13/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Dismissed

10/13/2020: Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Dismissed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/13/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/30/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Notice of Ruling Filed

8/5/2020: Notice of Notice of Ruling Filed

Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant

6/12/2020: Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant

Notice of of Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint Filed

4/24/2020: Notice of of Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint Filed

Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 10/30/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

5/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Motion for Summary Judgment 10/30/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

5/19/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Farmers Insurance Exchange Filed

12/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Farmers Insurance Exchange Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Copart-Dallas Inc

11/22/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Copart-Dallas Inc

First Amended Complaint Filed

5/28/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Declaration Filed

5/2/2019: Declaration Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Copart-Dallas Inc, Farmers Insurance Exchange

3/25/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Copart-Dallas Inc, Farmers Insurance Exchange

Notice of Acknowledgment of Service Filed

3/8/2019: Notice of Acknowledgment of Service Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Farmers Group, Inc. Filed

1/2/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Farmers Group, Inc. Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

1/2/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter re Request for Refund Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections of Luis Garcia Moreno Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Copart-Dallas Inc, Farmers Insurance Exchange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Strike Complaint; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Farmers Group, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Farmers Group, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Copart-Dallas Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Luis Garcia Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARMERS GROUP INC DBA FARMERS UNDERWRITERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, CATHERINE M.