This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 16:34:55 (UTC).

Moreno VS Brightview Landscape Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Moreno filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1313

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO, RICARDO MENDEZ

Defendant

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DARABI, PARVIZ

EMMERT, BENJAMIN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address Filed

5/29/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

2/5/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno - action until comoletion of binding

2/4/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno - action until comoletion of binding

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

1/28/2020: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/28/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Brightview Landscape Services, Inc

12/19/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Brightview Landscape Services, Inc

Initial Case Management Conference 03/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

11/1/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/1/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/30/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno

10/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno

Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

10/30/2019: Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Termination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stay Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Stay Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno - action until comoletion of binding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/25/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/11/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 09/03/2021 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/28/2020 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Brightview Landscape Services, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 02/19/2020 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Reservation Set for dept: 520 date: 02/19/2020 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ricardo Mendez Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less