This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 05:40:39 (UTC).

Montoya VS Albay Construction Company

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Montoya filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Albay Construction Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2155

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

CHEVRON USA, INC.

COASTAL WEST VENTURES, INC.

DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, THE

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

FLUOR CORPORATION

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE

GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

KRB, INC.

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

PLANT MAINTENANCE, INC.

REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

RILEY POWER, INC.

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

CALARESO, CHRISTINE D.

BASSI, MARTE J.

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

DUFFY, JOSEPH

KHARE, VIIU SPANGLER

KIM, JASON J.

LANGBORD, PETER B

MANOLI, C.J.

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHER B.

CHAVES, MARISA R.

GOETZ ESQ, ANDY J.

SANTANA, CARMEN

WOOD, J. SCOTT

ARMSTRONG, WILLIAM H.

ESTRADA, MICHAEL J.

NICHOLS, STEPHEN M.

TAQI-EDDIN, KHALED

ADAMS, ABIGAIL P

LOVE, MARK A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/17/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

6/21/2021: Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

9/20/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

8/3/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed

9/14/2021: STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc.

8/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc.

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

8/24/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for darcoid Company of California, The

8/25/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for darcoid Company of California, The

Answer to Complaint Filed for Albay Construction Company

8/20/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Albay Construction Company

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

8/19/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Case Management Statement of Adolfo Martin Montoya, Wendi D. Montoya Filed

8/6/2021: Case Management Statement of Adolfo Martin Montoya, Wendi D. Montoya Filed

Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

8/6/2021: Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Exxonmobil Oil Corporation Filed

8/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Exxonmobil Oil Corporation Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Parker Hannifin Corporation Filed

8/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Parker Hannifin Corporation Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. Filed

8/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Union Oil Company Of California Filed

8/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Union Oil Company Of California Filed

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for darcoid Company of California, The

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Adolfo Martin Montoya

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KRB INC. DBA RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where TIMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL WEST VENTURES INC is a litigant