Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 06:43:52 (UTC).

Montessori Children's House of Rockridge VS Fisher

Case Summary

On 06/11/1997 Montessori Children's House of Rockridge filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fisher. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL BREWSTER BEREOLA and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2414

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wiley W Manuel Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

GAIL BREWSTER BEREOLA

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

MONTESSORI CHILDREN'S HOUSE OF ROCKRIDGE

Defendants and Others

FISHER, ANDREW

FISHER, KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PEDDER, WILLIAM ROBERT

PARKER, LANE

 

Court Documents

Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

6/11/1997: Complaint Breach of Contract Filed

Answer To Complaint Filed for Andrew Fisher

9/3/1997: Answer To Complaint Filed for Andrew Fisher

Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed for Defendant

9/11/1997: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed for Defendant

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Montessori Children's House of Rockridge

11/3/1997: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Montessori Children's House of Rockridge

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

1/6/1998: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Settlement Conference Statement Filed

3/17/1998: Settlement Conference Statement Filed

Settlement Conference Statement Filed

3/24/1998: Settlement Conference Statement Filed

File Transmitted to Arbitration Dept.-Superior Court Filed

4/15/1998: File Transmitted to Arbitration Dept.-Superior Court Filed

Acknowledgement of Receipt of File in Arbitration Filed

4/24/1998: Acknowledgement of Receipt of File in Arbitration Filed

Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

8/6/1998: Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

Notice of Recission Of arbitrator Filed

9/10/1998: Notice of Recission Of arbitrator Filed

Notice of Final Assignment of Arbitrator Filed

9/10/1998: Notice of Final Assignment of Arbitrator Filed

Award of Arbitrator Filed

9/10/1998: Award of Arbitrator Filed

Informal Correspondence to / from re arbitration decision and ptsc of 10/27/98 Issued and Filed

10/22/1998: Informal Correspondence to / from re arbitration decision and ptsc of 10/27/98 Issued and Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

10/27/1998: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

10/27/1998: Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

Hearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 12/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

10/27/1998: Hearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 12/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Judgment Arbitration Award Judicial Filed

3/5/1999: Judgment Arbitration Award Judicial Filed

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Arbitration Award Judicial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Pursuant to Arbitration Award Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 03/05/1999 02:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Failure to Comply w/ Local Rules - Complaint; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 03/01/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Breach of Contract; Judge: Gail Brewster Bereola; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 12/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/1998
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 12/28/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Montessori Children's House of Rockridge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Montessori Children's House of Rockridge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/1997
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Dropped from dept: 14 date: 10/02/1997 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/1997
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Reservation Set for dept: 14 date: 10/02/1997 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/1997
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion 10/02/1997 09:00 AM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Complaint Filed for Andrew Fisher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Complaint Filed for Karen Fisher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less