This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 04:36:28 (UTC).

Monroe VS BBi Construction, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Monroe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BBi Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6717

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROE, LLOYD JR.

Defendants

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AOF ST. MARKS , LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ST. MARKS PRESERVATION, LP

BBI CONSTRUCTION, INC.

AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION ,M A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRADY, STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/19/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

10/19/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 02/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/13/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lloyd Monroe Jr.

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lloyd Monroe Jr.

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

10/13/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

11/2/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

11/3/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lloyd Monroe Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BBI CONSTRUCTION, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADY, STEVEN J.