This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 02:51:24 (UTC).

Monroe VS BBI Construction, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Monroe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BBI Construction, Inc . This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6429

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONROE, LLOYD JR.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AOF ST MARKS, LLC

BBI CONSTRUCTION, INC.,

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC

AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION

ST MARKS PRESERVATION, LP

BBI-CON, INC.

ST. MARKS PRESERVATION, LP

Cross Defendant

BEAMAN'S INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRADY, STEVEN J.

GARSON, EDWARD P.

KRONENBERG, WILLIAM S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

10/15/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Case Management Statement of St. Marks Preservation, LP Filed

9/14/2021: Case Management Statement of St. Marks Preservation, LP Filed

Case Management Statement of BBI-CON, Inc. Filed

9/15/2021: Case Management Statement of BBI-CON, Inc. Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

9/2/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BBI-CON, Inc.

9/7/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for BBI-CON, Inc.

Cross-Complaint Filed for BBI-CON, Inc.

9/7/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for BBI-CON, Inc.

Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

9/7/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Statement of Lloyd Monroe Jr. Filed

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement of Lloyd Monroe Jr. Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for St. Marks Preservation, LP

9/8/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for St. Marks Preservation, LP

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/8/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Dismissal of the Cause of Action

8/20/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Dismissal of the Cause of Action

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

8/20/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/5/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/07/2022 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of BBI-CON, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of St. Marks Preservation, LP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for St. Marks Preservation, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Lloyd Monroe Jr. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for St Marks Preservation, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien of Lien Claimant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Fairstead Affordable LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to AOF Pacific Affordable Housing Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to St Marks Preservation, LP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lloyd Monroe Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BBI CONSTRUCTION, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant