Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 02:33:27 (UTC).

Mohamed VS Abdrahman

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Mohamed filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Abdrahman. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3580

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMED, ABDULLA K

Defendant

ABDRAHMAN, SHARAF N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COHEN, MICHAEL C.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

9/22/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

9/24/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

7/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

5/11/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/17/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

5/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/17/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

Master Jury Trial Called and Completed

5/13/2019: Master Jury Trial Called and Completed

Settlement Conference Statement of Abdulla K Mohamed Filed

5/7/2019: Settlement Conference Statement of Abdulla K Mohamed Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

5/8/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Master Jury Trial 05/13/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

4/24/2019: Master Jury Trial 05/13/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

4/15/2019: At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 05/09/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

4/17/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 05/09/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/08/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

4/17/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/08/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Answer to Complaint Filed for Sharaf N Abdrahman

4/10/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Sharaf N Abdrahman

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

4/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

4/5/2019: Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abdulla K Mohamed

4/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abdulla K Mohamed

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

4/4/2019: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/17/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/22/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 05/04/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Agreement Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMaster Jury Trial Called and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/08/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial 05/09/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Sharaf N Abdrahman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abdulla K Mohamed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN, MICHAEL C.