This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 15:02:06 (UTC).

Mitchell VS TPS Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 Mitchell filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TPS Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2220

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL, PATRICIA

Defendants

TPS SOLUTIONS, INC.

TRAVIS, ELLIS

METTLER-TOLEDO RAININ, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SIVARAJAH, MYTHILY

WOODARD, JOAN C.

AUSTIN, NATHAN W.

KENNON, ALICIA R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

12/11/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

Declaration of P Ann Surapruik in support of Request for IDC Filed

11/17/2020: Declaration of P Ann Surapruik in support of Request for IDC Filed

Declaration in Response to Plaintiff's Request for IDC Filed

11/19/2020: Declaration in Response to Plaintiff's Request for IDC Filed

Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/21/2020: Notice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Proof of Service Filed

9/3/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Case Management Statement of Patricia Mitchell Filed

9/3/2020: Case Management Statement of Patricia Mitchell Filed

Case Management Statement of Ellis Travis Filed

9/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Ellis Travis Filed

Case Management Statement of Mettler-Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

9/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Mettler-Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

8/5/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Ellis Travis

8/3/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ellis Travis

Proof of Service CMC Filed

7/15/2020: Proof of Service CMC Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

7/17/2020: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party TPS Solutions, Inc. Filed

7/20/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party TPS Solutions, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Patricia Mitchell Filed

6/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Patricia Mitchell Filed

Case Management Statement of TPS Solutions, Inc. Filed

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement of TPS Solutions, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Mettler-Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement of Mettler-Toledo Rainin, LLC Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Complaint - Other Employment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Hearing Confirmed for 03/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Response to Plaintiff's Request for IDC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of P Ann Surapruik in support of Request for IDC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to TPS Solutions, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Patricia Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TPS SOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where METTLER-TOLEDO RAININ, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIVARAJAH, MYTHILY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODARD, JOAN C.