This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:45:40 (UTC).

Mitchell VS Perry

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Mitchell filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Perry. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT MCGUINESS, THOMAS RASCH and JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2376

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT MCGUINESS

THOMAS RASCH

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MITCHELL, MATTHEW

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PERRY, ROBERTA

PERRY, MEAGAN

PERRY, JOSHUA

PERRY, THOMAS

PERRY, MEGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BLACK, JONATHAN

POWELL, HOLIDAY DREESSEN

TAKANO, JESSICA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

9/17/2020: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Matthew Mitchell

9/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Matthew Mitchell

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

9/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Filed

6/25/2020: Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Matthew Mitchell Filed

12/23/2019: Case Management Statement of Matthew Mitchell Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

11/22/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

9/9/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Dept. 303 Sign in sheet Filed

9/9/2019: Dept. 303 Sign in sheet Filed

Dept. 303 Sign In Sheet Filed

8/7/2019: Dept. 303 Sign In Sheet Filed

Settlement Conference Statement of Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry Filed

7/31/2019: Settlement Conference Statement of Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/5/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry Filed

5/21/2019: Case Management Statement of Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry Filed

Case Management Statement of Matthew Mitchell Filed

5/21/2019: Case Management Statement of Matthew Mitchell Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry

2/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Joshua Perry, Thomas Perry, Roberta Perry, Megan Perry

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/17/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/01/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

12/18/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 05/01/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Matthew Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Matthew Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Hearing Confirmed for 09/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 2

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Roberta Perry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Meagan Perry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Thomas Perry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Joshua Perry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/01/2019 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Matthew Mitchell

    Read MoreRead Less