This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/05/2020 at 03:47:10 (UTC).

Mission Bell Supportive Housing LLC VS Laurell

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 Mission Bell Supportive Housing LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Laurell. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5782

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION BELL SUPPORTIVE HOUSING LLC

Defendant

LAURELL, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LI, LAURIE

 

Court Documents

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Proposed Judgment

9/23/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Proposed Judgment

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

3/11/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued

10/2/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

7/5/2019: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mission Bell Supportive Housing LLC

7/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mission Bell Supportive Housing LLC

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/5/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael Laurell

7/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael Laurell

Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

7/23/2019: Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Laurell Filed

7/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Laurell Filed

Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered

7/23/2019: Request for Entry of Default as to all un-named tenants/occupants Filed and Entered

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

7/23/2019: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

7/23/2019: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 08/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

7/24/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 08/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/14/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

7/24/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/14/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael Laurell

7/25/2019: Amended Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael Laurell

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

8/14/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Settlement Agreement Approved

8/14/2019: Settlement Agreement Approved

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued

9/23/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Ex-Parte 10/16/2019 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Ex-Parte dept: 511 date: 10/10/2019 time: 09:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Laurell Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Michael Laurell Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Michael Laurell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Michael Laurell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketFee Deposited per 6103 Government Code Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mission Bell Supportive Housing LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less