This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 04:30:48 (UTC).

Mish VS Tforce Freight, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Mish filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tforce Freight, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Julia Spain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5108

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Julia Spain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donyeisha Mish

Defendant

TFORCE FREIGHT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Brian Davis Berry

Samuel D. Almon, Esq

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

9/28/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

7/15/2021: Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Notice of Related Case

03/25/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case

02/14/2022: Notice of Related Case

Order (Proposed) Order Granting Substitution of Attorney

12/17/2021: Order (Proposed) Order Granting Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Mail

12/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney

12/17/2021: Substitution of Attorney

General Order (Case Management Order and TRIAL SETTING ORDER)

10/30/2021: General Order (Case Management Order and TRIAL SETTING ORDER)

Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

10/07/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Tforce Freight, Inc.

10/01/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Tforce Freight, Inc.

Case Management Conference Order Issued

09/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

09/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted Ex parte Extension of Time to respond granted

09/29/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted Ex parte Extension of Time to respond granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Tforce Freight, Inc.

09/23/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Tforce Freight, Inc.

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

09/28/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

09/28/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Related Case Filed by: Tforce Freight, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Related Case Filed by: Tforce Freight, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Brian Davis Berry (Attorney):Name Suffix: blankMiddle Name changed from D. to Davis; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed by: Tforce Freight, Inc. (Defendant) As to: Donyeisha Mish (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Tforce Freight, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/30/2021; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order and TRIAL SETTING ORDER) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 302; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 09/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Complex Determination Hearing 08/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: TR - Motion Denied; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 09/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 08/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donyeisha Mish; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TFORCE FREIGHT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERRY, BRIAN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALMON SAMUEL D.