This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:19:08 (UTC).

Miranda VS Capital One Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Miranda filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Capital One Financial Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3096

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL, ALAIN

MIRANDA, RONEY

Defendants

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GIBBS, ERIC H.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

9/24/2021: Case Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roney Miranda

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roney Miranda

Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

9/17/2021: Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roney Miranda

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Financial Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant