This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 21:22:37 (UTC).

Mirabrishami VS R. Michael Alvarez D.D.S. Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2000 Mirabrishami filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R Michael Alvarez D D S Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN P. ZYLKA, MICHAEL DIAS and SUSAN P. BENEVILLE,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7849

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN P. ZYLKA

MICHAEL DIAS

SUSAN P. BENEVILLE,

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Others and Debtor / Appellees

MIRABRISHAMI, DJAFAR

R. MICHAEL ALVAREZ D.D.S. INC.

Debtor / Appellee, Defendant and Other

R. MICHAEL ALVAREZ D.D.S. INC.

 

Court Documents

Judgment Entered

1/5/2001: Judgment Entered

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore

1/5/2001: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore

Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

1/5/2001: Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Continued

12/15/2000: Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Continued

Small Claims Appeal 12/15/2000 09:00 AM D- 521

11/3/2000: Small Claims Appeal 12/15/2000 09:00 AM D- 521

Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

11/3/2000: Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

Judgment Entered

10/10/2000: Judgment Entered

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

10/10/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

10/10/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/20/2000: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Djafar Mirabrishami, R. Michael

9/7/2000: Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Djafar Mirabrishami, R. Michael

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

7/31/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Appeal of SC Judgment; Judge: Susan P. Beneville, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2001
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Defendant on Claim of Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Appeal of SC Judgment; Judge: John P. Zylka; Department: Dept 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2000
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Appeal dept: 521 date: 01/05/2001 time: 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal Commenced and Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2000
  • DocketRecord on Appeal transmitted to Superior Court Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal 12/15/2000 09:00 AM D- 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Michael Dias; Department: Dept 606

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2000
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to R. Michael Alvarez D.D.S. Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to Djafar Mirabrishami, R. Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/10/2000 08:30 AM D- 606

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less