This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 11:24:46 (UTC).

Miller VS Kaiser Foundation Health Plan

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Miller filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2713

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER , TINA

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NICHOLAS, CRAIG M.

ROWLEY, CHRISTIAN J

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/07/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

9/7/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/07/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

Tentative Case Management Order

9/2/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Answer to Complaint Filed for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. , Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The

7/26/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. , Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, The

Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

6/24/2021: Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

9/7/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ,

8/9/2021: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ,

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Granted

8/10/2021: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Granted

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/3/2021: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

8/3/2021: Motion Granted

Order re Case Management Filed

8/4/2021: Order re Case Management Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/4/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed

7/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed

7/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Filed

7/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

7/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

6/17/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/17/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tina Miller

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tina Miller

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/07/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re Case Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Other Employment; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tina Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant