This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 12:07:27 (UTC).

Milatzo VS First Street Shell

Case Summary

On 03/03/2000 Milatzo filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against First Street Shell. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4449

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FILI, SHELLEY

MILATZO, FRANK J. III

Defendant

FIRST STREET SHELL

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

3/3/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

3/7/2000: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

4/7/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

4/7/2000: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

4/7/2000: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/14/2000: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

4/14/2000: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 702 date: 04/14/2000 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Valid As to First Street Shell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2000
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 04/07/2000 03:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less