This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/11/2022 at 15:42:03 (UTC).

Midland Funding VS Smith

Case Summary

On 03/17/2009 Midland Funding filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, George E Mcdonald Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Thomas Rasch. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1777

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Thomas Rasch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

Lynette D Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Erica L. Brachfeld

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Service by Mail

06/09/2010: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proposed Judgment Request

03/01/2010: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

03/01/2010: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

03/01/2010: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

Declaration Request

03/01/2010: Declaration Request

Declaration Other: Request

03/01/2010: Declaration Other: Request

Proposed Judgment Request

06/25/2009: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request 1 to 100

06/25/2009: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request 1 to 100

Declaration re Waiver of Attorney Fees Request

06/25/2009: Declaration re Waiver of Attorney Fees Request

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

06/25/2009: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 Request

Declaration Request Re: Interest

06/25/2009: Declaration Request Re: Interest

Declaration Other: Request CCP 585

06/25/2009: Declaration Other: Request CCP 585

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

08/03/2010: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice - Entire Action

Case Management Statement of Midland Funding LLC Filed

07/26/2010: Case Management Statement of Midland Funding LLC Filed

Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed

07/22/2010: Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed

Limited Collections Order

06/09/2010: Limited Collections Order

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

06/09/2010: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected Rejection of Default Judgment Request

04/27/2010: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected Rejection of Default Judgment Request

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Midland Funding LLC Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Name and Address Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 08/09/2010 09:30 AM D- 303; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Limited Collections Order; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 06/09/2010 01:30 PM D- 303; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Request Re: Interest; Category: DCL041

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request CCP 585; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketMessage: Default Entered as to Lynette D Smith. Judgment Routed to Judge; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Lynette D Smith Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lynette D Smith Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DocketMessage: File Control : file received at GEM; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • DocketMessage: File Control Sent to G.E. McDonald from RCD; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Midland Funding; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brachfeld, Erica L