This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/06/2020 at 09:11:43 (UTC).

Merritt Street, LLC VS Jazz Financial Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Merritt Street, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jazz Financial Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY BRAND, JENNA WHITMAN and PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4477

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY BRAND

JENNA WHITMAN

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRITT STREET, LLC

Defendant

JAZZ FINANCIAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HANDLER, ERIC A.

GOINS II, VERNON C.

STEIN, DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address Filed

12/17/2019: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

11/20/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

11/7/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Trial Memorandum Filed

10/24/2019: Trial Memorandum Filed

Stipulation Filed

10/24/2019: Stipulation Filed

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

10/23/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

10/24/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

9/23/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

9/23/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

9/27/2019: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

9/27/2019: At-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 10/24/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

10/1/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 10/24/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

10/1/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/23/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Answer to Complaint Filed for Jazz Financial Inc.

9/18/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Jazz Financial Inc.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/10/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

9/10/2019: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street, LLC

9/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street, LLC

Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

9/11/2019: Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial dept: 511 date: 11/21/2019 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 11/07/2019 09:30 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial dept: 511 date: 11/07/2019 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial 10/24/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Jazz Financial Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOINS II, VERNON C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDLER ERIC A