This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 01:50:09 (UTC).

Merritt Street LLC VS Greatwall Building Contractor Inc

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Merritt Street LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Greatwall Building Contractor Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4519

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRITT STREET LLC

Defendant

GREATWALL BUILDING CONTRACTOR INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STEIN, DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

7/30/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Declaration of K. Jacob in Support of Petition to Release Claim of Lien and For an Order Awarding Re

7/1/2020: Declaration of K. Jacob in Support of Petition to Release Claim of Lien and For an Order Awarding Re

Case Management Statement of Merritt Street LLC Filed

6/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Merritt Street LLC Filed

Notice of Hearing on Petition To Release Claim Of Lein And For Attornrys Fees and Costs Filed

6/18/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition To Release Claim Of Lein And For Attornrys Fees and Costs Filed

Supplemental Declaration in Support (David A Stein) in support Of Petition to Release Claim Of Lein

6/18/2020: Supplemental Declaration in Support (David A Stein) in support Of Petition to Release Claim Of Lein

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

2/19/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 07/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/19/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street LLC

2/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street LLC

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

2/14/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Proposed Order Filed

2/14/2020: Proposed Order Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

2/14/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of K. Jacob in Support of Petition to Release Claim of Lien and For an Order Awarding Re

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration in Support (David A Stein) in support Of Petition to Release Claim Of Lein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition To Release Claim Of Lein And For Attornrys Fees and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMotion Reservation Set for dept: 518 date: 08/12/2020 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Merritt Street LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Merritt Street LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREATWALL BUILDING CONTRACTOR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.