This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:48:16 (UTC).

Mercer VS Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Mercer filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5742

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

MERCER, JAMES

MERCER, KRISTIN

PALACIOS PAINTING

START TILE

THE HARDWOOD AVENUE

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

TRIANGLE CONSTRUCTION TRI-VALLEY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HANSEN, CRAIG ALAN

ACREE, MARISSA N.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/16/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

8/2/2021: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

Case Management Statement of James Mercer, Kristin Mercer Filed

8/2/2021: Case Management Statement of James Mercer, Kristin Mercer Filed

Case Management Statement of Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc. Filed

8/5/2021: Case Management Statement of Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc. Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

6/28/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

6/28/2021: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

6/28/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

5/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

4/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/1/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Mercer

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Mercer

Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

4/16/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

4/20/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/20/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/30/2023 11:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/13/2023 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 04/10/2023 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/30/2023 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Triangle Construction Tri-Valley, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Rene C. Davidson Alam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Mercer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where START TILE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACREE, MARISSA N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSEN, CRAIG A.