This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:16:51 (UTC).

Mendoza VS Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2993

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA , BIANCA

Defendant

BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LARIAN, ALEXANDER M

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

9/17/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bianca Mendoza

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bianca Mendoza

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/17/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/20/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

9/20/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

9/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/15/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bianca Mendoza

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARIAN, ALEXANDER M